CT SB00133 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the licensure requirements for professional counselors.
Title
An Act Concerning Licensing For Professional Counselors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-06 | Senate | File Number 505 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 331 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |