CT SB00133 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To change existing apprentice to journeymen and contractor hiring ratios for certain tradespersons.
Title
An Act Concerning Apprentice To Journeymen And Contractor Ratios.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-04 | Public Act 10-27 | |
2010-04-27 | In Concurrence | |
2010-04-27 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed | |
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 388 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-03-23 | File Number 83 | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Calendar Number 94 | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-05 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2010-03-05 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2010-03-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-02 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |