CT SB00098 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for a longer six foot draw down period of Lake Beseck in odd-numbered years in order to increase the likelihood of root exposure for aquatic plants to temperatures that assist in the effective management of such plants.
Title
An Act Concerning The Draw Down Schedule On Lake Beseck.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |