CT SB00059 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To include certain members of the Emergency Response and Spill Prevention division within the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection in the definition of "hazardous duty members" for the purpose of the hazardous duty retirement credit.
Title
An Act Concerning Hazardous Duty Retirement For Certain Employees At The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | File Number 50 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 86 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |