CT HB06593 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - File Number 477
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - File Number 477
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that a mortgagee does not enter upon the residential real property that is the subject of the mortgage without the permission of the owner, occupant or mortgagor or an order of a court.
Title
An Act Protecting A Mortgagor From An Unreasonable Invasion Of His Or Her Privacy By A Mortgage Holder.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Sen. Gary Winfield [D] | Rep. Douglas Dubitsky [R] |
Rep. Christine Pavalock-D'Amato [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | File Number 477 |
2021-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 346 |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |