CT HB06550 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - File Number 8
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - File Number 8
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require employers or insurers acting on behalf of employers to (1) provide notice of a proposed discontinuance or reduction of coverage of an employee's prescription medication, and (2) obtain approval before such discontinuance or reduction takes effect.
Title
An Act Requiring Notice Of Discontinuance Of Prescription Medication Under A Workers' Compensation Claim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | File Number 8 |
2023-03-06 | House | House Calendar Number 28 |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 12:00 PM |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-01-27 | House | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |