CT HB05520 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) define homeowners insurance, (2) prohibit the declination, cancellation or nonrenewal of a homeowners insurance policy or a limit on the amount of or provisions of coverage based on the covered property's proximity to another occupied residential dwelling or the condition of such dwelling, (3) require notices of cancellation of private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance policies to be sent by registered or certified mail, return receipt requested, and (4) prohibit automobile insurers from requiring a minimum amount of coverage greater than the amounts set forth in section 14-112 of the general statutes as a condition to issue or renew an automobile liability insurance policy.
Title
An Act Concerning Homeowners And Motor Vehicle Insurance Policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 408 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 412 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 412 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | House | Public Act 16-136 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2016-04-25 | House | File Number 729 |
2016-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 501 |
2016-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2016-04-21 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4540 |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2016-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4017 |
2016-03-30 | House | File Number 289 |
2016-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 213 |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |