CT HB05386 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To strengthen provisions of the law concerning pay equity and fairness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Pay Equity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 204 PASS IN CONCURRENCE (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 53 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-05-10HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-10HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-09HousePublic Act 18-8
2018-05-04HouseIn Concurrence
2018-05-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-04HouseSenate Passed
2018-04-23HouseFile Number 644
2018-04-23HouseSenate Calendar Number 383
2018-04-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-04-19HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3879
2018-04-04HouseFile Number 196
2018-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 155
2018-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-02HousePublic Hearing 03/08
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback