CT HB05355 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - File Number 668
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - File Number 668
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require postings and trainings on sexual and domestic violence to employees of state agencies.
Title
An Act Concerning Domestic Violence Posting In The Workplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | File Number 668 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 508 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4887 |
2022-04-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2022-04-04 | House | File Number 280 |
2022-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 211 |
2022-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |