CT HB05345 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit health care providers to enter into cooperative arrangements that would be exempt from certain antitrust laws after receiving approval from the Attorney General.
Title
An Act Concerning Cooperative Health Care Arrangements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-02 | House | File Number 298 |
2014-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 178 |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |