CT HB05251 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide dispatchers with portal-to-portal workers' compensation coverage.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation For Dispatchers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | House | File Number 75 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 98 |
2022-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |