CT HB05149 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit sober living homes to register with the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services.
Title
An Act Concerning Sober Living Homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 387 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 245 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 246 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 245 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 246 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Public Act 18-171 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 543 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5558 |
2018-04-10 | House | File Number 348 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 222 |
2018-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |