CO SJM002 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-28)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-28)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Senator John (Jack) Taylor.
Title
Memorialize Senator John (Jack) Taylor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House: MEMORIALS Mem (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/24/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |