CO SB270 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an increase in the alcohol beverage production limits for a retail establishment licensed to produce alcohol beverages on its premises.
Title
Increase Alcohol Beverages On-premises Production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-270 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-270 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-270 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-270 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |