CO SB231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a transfer of money from the general fund to the energy fund to finance the weatherization assistance program of the Colorado energy office.
Title
Energy Office Weatherization Assistance Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |