CO SB049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-22)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-22)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning updating the "Victim Rights Act".
Title
Victim Rights Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |