CO SB015 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-9)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-9)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a stipend for veterans service organizations that provide funeral services for honorably discharged veterans, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Veterans Service Organization Stipend For Funeral Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-22 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |