CA SB1267 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 56.18) to Part 2.6 of Division 1 of the Civil Code, relating to genetic information.
Title
Genetic Information Privacy Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-14 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3309.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 56.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 105280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 109910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |