AZ SB1407 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

DUI; incarceration credits; calculation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DUI; incarceration credits; calculation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26SenateChapter 148
2021-03-26SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-03-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-10HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-17HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-17SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-02-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-04SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2021-01-28SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-27SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
281446New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75443
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1407p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1407s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0148.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1407petersen0816.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482730
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484576
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486604
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487059
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487480
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488456
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75443&billStatusActionId=200678&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75443&billStatusActionId=200746&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75443&billStatusActionId=203230&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75443&billStatusActionId=203297&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback