AZ SB1308 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to House COM Committee
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to House COM Committee
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Return to work program
Title
Return to work program
Sponsors
Sen. Olivia Bedford [D] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] |
Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] | Rep. Mark Cardenas [D] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |