AZ SB1275 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of gaming; continuation
Title
Department of gaming; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 36 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-3-5-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-3-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3020.16 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |