AZ SB1162 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; CPR instruction
Title
Schools; CPR instruction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |