AZ SB1158 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

JTED; nomination signatures; mailing dates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JTED; nomination signatures; mailing dates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-19HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-0-0-0)
2015-03-16HouseReferred to House ELECT Committee
2015-03-16HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0)
2015-03-10HouseReferred to House ELECT Committee
2015-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2015-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-03-16HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2015-03-09HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2015-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2015-03-04SenateTransmit to House
2015-03-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2015-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-02-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-01-26SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-19SenateSenate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2015-01-27SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2015-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2015-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2015-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=114&Bill_Number=SB1158
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1158p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1158s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/s.1158ad.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/s.1158jud.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.1158mu.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/h.1158-elect.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.1158semu.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.1158-p1-clark.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/h.1158-se-elect rereferral.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1158.sjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1158.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1158.helect.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1158.helect.2.asp

Bill Comments 750

feedback