AZ SB1018 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-5-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-5-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bingo; licenses; taxes
Title
Bingo; licenses; taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-5-0-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Application For License
Bingo
Compensation
Emergency
Equipment
Expenses
Licenses
Premises
Qualifications
Renewal
Repeal
Taxes
Transfer
Application For License
Bingo
Compensation
Emergency
Equipment
Expenses
Licenses
Premises
Qualifications
Renewal
Repeal
Taxes
Transfer
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 413 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 415 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |