AZ HB2903 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1834
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2903 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2903 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; inspections; licensing; financial ownership
Title
Marijuana; inspections; licensing; financial ownership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2903 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2903 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1834 (Replaced by) 2021-06-29 - Chapter 387
Subjects
Civil Penalty
Dispensary
Early Applicants
Fees
Financial Ownership
Inspections
Legal Counsel
Licensing
Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Dispensaries
Nonprofit
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Rfeir
Rules
Testing
Dispensary
Early Applicants
Fees
Financial Ownership
Inspections
Legal Counsel
Licensing
Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Dispensaries
Nonprofit
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Rfeir
Rules
Testing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |