AZ SB1834 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2903
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; inspections; licensing; financial ownership.
Title
Marijuana; inspections; licensing; financial ownership.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1834 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1834 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Chapter 387 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1834 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2903 (Replaces) 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2903 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Subjects
Financial Ownership
Inspections
Licensing
Marijuana
Marijuana Testing Facility
Nonprofit Medical Marijuana Dispensary
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Rfeir (h)
Inspections
Licensing
Marijuana
Marijuana Testing Facility
Nonprofit Medical Marijuana Dispensary
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Rfeir (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |