AZ HB2701 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TPT; health sciences institutions; exemption
Title
TPT; health sciences institutions; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 276 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |