AZ HB2416 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School district governing boards; qualifications
Title
School district governing boards; qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 202 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-24 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (48-7-4-0) |
2017-04-24 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-11 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-11 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-15-2-0) |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |