AZ HB2384 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Abortion; public funding prohibition; taxes
Title
Abortion; public funding prohibition; taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Rep. Steve Court [R] | Sen. Rich Crandall [R] | Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] |
Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Rep. Nancy McLain [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Rep. Amanda Reeve [R] |
Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Sen. Michelle Ugenti-Rita [R] |
Rep. Steve Urie [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-7-2-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | House third reading , voting: (40-18-2-0) | |
2011-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |