AZ HB2268 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; total compensation statements
Title
Schools; total compensation statements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 260 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 189 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |