AZ HB2058 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sovereign authority; federal rules; regulations
Title
Sovereign authority; federal rules; regulations
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House FSR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |