AR HB1474 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Protect The Rights And Privileges Granted Under The United States Constitution And The Arkansas Constitution; To Declare American Laws For American Courts.
Title
To Protect The Rights And Privileges Granted Under The United States Constitution And The Arkansas Constitution; To Declare American Laws For American Courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Smith [R] | Sen. John Cooper [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] |
Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R] | Sen. Scott Flippo [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Sen. Jim Hendren [I] | Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] |
Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Rep. Dwight Tosh [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Motion to withdraw HB 1474 from Judiciary Committee FAILED (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Motion to withdraw HB 1474 from Judiciary Committee FAILED |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |