AL HB216 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to motor vehicle licenses and registration; to amend Section 32-6-62, Code of Alabama 1975, to extend the validity period of motor vehicle license plate designs from five years to 10 years.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle licenses and registration; to amend Section 32-6-62, Code of Alabama 1975, to extend the validity period of motor vehicle license plate designs from five years to 10 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-04-25 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-25 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House State Government |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to House State Government |
2023-03-23 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |