WY SF0058 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; amending duties and composition of the Wyoming health insurance exchange steering committee as specified; requiring a report and specifying reporting requirements; limiting the state's authority to operate a federally required health insurance exchange as specified; reappropriating funds, providing an appropriation and clarifying authorized expenditures; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Health insurance exchange study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042 | |
2012-03-07 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0042 | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA0042 | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Did Concur | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-15 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |