WY SF0047 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to controlled substances; providing for specified boards regulating health care practitioners to require continuing education related to controlled substances; requiring electronic prescriptions for controlled substances; requiring practitioners to search the controlled substance prescription tracking program; exempting veterinarians from required use of the program; authorizing exceptions; requiring the state board of pharmacy to provide specified information from the prescription tracking program to providers and dispensers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances education and administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 153
2019-02-28 Governor Signed SEA No. 0066
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0066
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0066
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0066
2019-02-25SenateConcur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2019-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0
2019-02-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-15HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2019-01-16Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-15SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-14SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback