WY HB0153 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to worker's compensation; requiring worker's compensation coverage premiums and rates to be competitive with nationwide coverage premiums and rates; requiring reporting; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Worker's compensation competitive coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Byron [R] | Rep. Jon Conrad [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Joshua Larson [R] |
Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Tony Niemiec [R] | Rep. Ember Oakley [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Cody Wylie [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Sen. Stacy Jones [R] | Sen. John Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-20 - House - H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-20 | House | H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |