WY HB0130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to holidays; making legislative findings; designating the third week of September as Wyoming Cowboy and Cowgirl Legacy Week; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Cowboy and Cowgirl Legacy Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-1-4-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 154
2019-02-28 Governor Signed HEA No. 0095
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0095
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0095
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0095
2019-02-25HouseConcur:Passed 36-22-2-0-0
2019-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22House3rd Reading:Passed 55-1-4-0-0
2019-01-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-17HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback