WY HB0092 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to parental rights; specifying applicability of parental rights protections; specifying duties for school district boards of trustees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Protection of parental rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] | Rep. Cody Wylie [R] | Sen. John Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Adopted HB0092JC001: 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Adopted HB0092JC001: 41-20-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Concur:Failed 24-37-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Amendment failed 27-35-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 54-7-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Adopted HB0092JC001: 41-20-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Concur:Failed 24-37-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Amendment failed 27-35-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 54-7-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 110 | |
2024-03-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0055 | |
2024-03-08 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0055 |
2024-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0055 |
2024-03-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0055 | |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2024-03-07 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2024-03-07 | House | Concur:Failed 24-37-1-0-0 |
2024-03-07 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2024-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-1-0-0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2024-03-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-03-04 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 |
2024-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2024-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-19 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 54-7-1-0-0 |
2024-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |