WY HB0059 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the legislature; modifying the legislative constituent service allowance as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constituent service allowance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Did Not Adopt HB0059JC001: 10-19-1-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - Adopted HB0059JC001: 52-5-3-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Concur:Failed 7-51-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-28SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-28SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-22SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-22HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-13SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-13HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-13HouseConcur:Failed 7-51-2-0-0
2019-02-12HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-12Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2019-02-11Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-08SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-01SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-01SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-14House3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0
2019-01-11House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-10HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-09HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-09HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback