WV SB847 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Updating controlled substance lists in schedules I and V

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating controlled substance lists in Schedules I and V

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 336) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2020-02-27HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 336)
2020-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-26SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2020-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-24SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-24SenateImmediate consideration
2020-02-24SenateReported do pass
2020-02-24SenateOriginating in Senate Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60A2204Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2212Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback