WV SB629 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand the conditions of permanent disability required for issuance of a Class Q permit.
Title
Expanding conditions of permanent disability required for Class Q permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 266) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 266) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Originating in Senate Natural Resources |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 46e | Amended Code | Citation Text |