WV SB583 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 304, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 304, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating program to further development of renewable energy resources
Title
Creating program to further development of renewable energy resources
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 470) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 456) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 444) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 443) (Y: 37 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 145) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 456) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 444) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 443) (Y: 37 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 145) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 304, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 470) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 456) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 444) |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 443) |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/2 |
2020-02-29 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/28 |
2020-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-17 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 145) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Smith Floor amendment #2 adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Smith Floor amendment #1 withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Having been read 2nd time 2/12/20 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/12/20, amend pending |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment reported |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/11/20 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2020-01-22 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-22 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Finance |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4562 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - To House Energy