WV SB570 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing training for law-enforcement in handling individuals with Alzheimer's and dementias
Title
Establishing training for law-enforcement in handling individuals with Alzheimer's and dementias
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 428) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 496) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 143) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 496) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 143) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 428) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 496) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-17 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 143) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-03 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-03 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4521 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 29 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |