WV SB545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to HIV testing
Title
Relating to HIV testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 320) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 320) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 401) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 320) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 401) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 320) |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 320) |
2019-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) |
2019-03-01 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 401) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-28 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2019-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2019-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-19 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2908 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 3C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |