WV SB499 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Tourist-Oriented Directional Signs Program. The bill states the legislative purpose. The bill sets forth the application and eligibility requirements for the program. The bill establishes the design and content guidelines and sign location and placement criteria. The bill also establishes a fee schedule and sets forth maintenance responsibility. The bill permits revocation of participation in the program. Further, the bill authorizes rule making to be exempt from the state Administrative Procedures Act, but shall be filed with the Secretary of State. The bill additionally defines terms.
Title
Creating Tourist-Oriented Directional Signs Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2015-03-03 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Finance |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Government Organization |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2015-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2940 (Same As) 2015-02-24 - To House Roads and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 29 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 29 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |