WV SB492 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing program for bonding to reclaim abandoned wind and solar generation facilities
Title
Establishing program for bonding to reclaim abandoned wind and solar generation facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 476) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 609) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 244) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 609) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 244) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-16 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 476) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 609) |
2021-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-10 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2021-04-10 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/10 |
2021-04-09 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment pending |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/8 |
2021-04-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Postponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 4/6 |
2021-04-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-02 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2021-03-31 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 244) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-25 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2021-03-01 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-01 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Finance |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2342 (Similar To) 2021-03-05 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 32 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 32 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 32 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 32 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 32 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 32 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 32 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 32 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |