WV SB443 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Approved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Supplemental appropriation of federal moneys to DHHR divisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriation of federal moneys to DHHR divisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 257) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 256) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 117) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 117) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseApproved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal
2019-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/7/19
2019-03-01HouseTo Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal
2019-03-01SenateTo Governor 3/1/19
2019-02-23SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-22HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-02-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-22HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 257)
2019-02-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 256)
2019-02-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-22HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-20HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-20HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-19HouseDo pass
2019-02-13HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-13HouseTo Finance
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-12SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-12SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 117)
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 117)
2019-02-12SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-12SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-11SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-08SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-07SenateReported do pass
2019-01-28SenateTo Finance
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-28SenateTo Finance
2019-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2782 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - To House Finance

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback