WV SB443 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-24 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-24 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require persons convicted of driving under the influence of alcohol and who are on probation, paroled or on other conditional release for that offense to participate in the Motor Vehicle Test and Lock Program. The bill establishes conditions for participation in the program. The bill also provides a sentencing court with the authority to set eligibility requirements for participation in the program.
Title
Requiring certain DUI offenders participate in Motor Vehicle Alcohol Test and Lock Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-24 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-23 | Effective July 1, 2010 (Roll No. 10) | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) | |
2010-02-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-23 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-19 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-19 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-18 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4304 (Same As) 2010-02-02 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 5 | 2b | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5A | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 5A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 5A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 5A | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=443&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |