WV SB423 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to amend the Aboveground Storage Tank Act to address and correct certain unintended consequences of the original enactment. The program is now focused on tanks with a capacity of 10,000 gallons or above within zones of critical concern of public water utilities. Definitions are amended and added. The owner or operator of a tank will certify its compliance with an approved industry standard or program, or to the standards developed by the DEP by rule. Releases are defined in the same way as in other programs administered by the Department of Environmental Protection. Spill prevention and response plans are required. Much of article 31 has been deleted although key provisions have been moved into article 30.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending Aboveground Storage Tank Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 7) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 518) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 517) (Y: 18 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 516) (Y: 32 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 129) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 128) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15SenateChapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
2015-03-18SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal
2015-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/15
2015-03-18HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal
2015-03-18HouseTo Governor 3/19/15 - House Journal
2015-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/19/15 - Senate Journal
2015-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/15
2015-03-14SenateCompleted legislative action
2015-03-14SenateCommunicated to House
2015-03-14SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 7)
2015-03-14SenateHouse Message received
2015-03-13HouseCommunicated to Senate
2015-03-13HousePassed House (Roll No. 518)
2015-03-13HouseRead 3rd time
2015-03-13HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment rejected (Voice vote)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 517)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 516)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2015-03-13HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2015-03-13HouseOn 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender
2015-03-12HouseAmendment pending
2015-03-12HouseRead 2nd time
2015-03-12HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2015-03-11HouseRead 1st time
2015-03-11HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2015-03-10HouseWith amendment, do pass
2015-03-02HouseTo House Judiciary
2015-03-02HouseTo Judiciary
2015-03-02HouseIntroduced in House
2015-02-28SenateOrdered to House
2015-02-28SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 16)
2015-02-28SenateDeferred until foot of 1st reading
2015-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2015-02-28SenateOn 3rd reading
2015-02-27SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2015-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-02-27SenateOn 2nd reading
2015-02-26SenateRead 1st time
2015-02-26SenateOn 1st reading
2015-02-25SenateCommittee substitute reported
2015-02-05SenateTo Judiciary
2015-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate
2015-02-05SenateTo Judiciary
2015-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2574 (Same As) 2015-02-03 - To House Judiciary
HB2560 (Same As) 2015-02-06 - To House Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1619fNew CodeSee Bill Text
223010Amended CodeCitation Text
223011Amended CodeCitation Text
223012Amended CodeCitation Text
223013Amended CodeCitation Text
223014Amended CodeCitation Text
223015Amended CodeCitation Text
223016Amended CodeCitation Text
223017Amended CodeCitation Text
223018Amended CodeCitation Text
223019Amended CodeCitation Text
22302Amended CodeCitation Text
223021Amended CodeCitation Text
223022Amended CodeCitation Text
223024Amended CodeCitation Text
223025Amended CodeCitation Text
223026New CodeSee Bill Text
223027New CodeSee Bill Text
22303Amended CodeCitation Text
22304Amended CodeCitation Text
22305Amended CodeCitation Text
22306Amended CodeCitation Text
22307Amended CodeCitation Text
22308Amended CodeCitation Text
22309Amended CodeCitation Text
223110Repealed CodeCitation Text
223111Repealed CodeCitation Text
223112Repealed CodeCitation Text
22312Amended CodeCitation Text
22313Repealed CodeCitation Text
22314Repealed CodeCitation Text
22315Repealed CodeCitation Text
22316Repealed CodeCitation Text
22317Repealed CodeCitation Text
22318Repealed CodeCitation Text
22319Repealed CodeCitation Text
510A2Amended CodeCitation Text
510A6Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=423&year=2015&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb423%20intr.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=423
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB423%20SUB1.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=423
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB423%20SUB1%20eng.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=423
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB423%20SUB1%20enr.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=423
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/02-28-0016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00516.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00517.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00518.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/03-14-0007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/02-13-0004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00128.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00129.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback