WV SB42 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize a municipality to commence a proceeding in a court of competent jurisdiction, in the county in which the abandoned property is located, to compel a foreclosure to assist municipalities to be able to better address the “zombie properties” that are plaguing communities across the state.
Title
Creating Zombie Property Remediation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/21 |
2021-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/23/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/21 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-18 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 188) |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2021-02-26 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/23/21 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |